LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE LAMBERT HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 1020296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide assistance to paitents and former patients of The Lambert Hospital, Thirsk and other invalids in the community who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped, infirm or in need of financial help; and generally to support the charitable work of The Lambert Hospital.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Jaynee Thackray Trustee 16 August 2017
LAMBERT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days
QUEENIE DOWSON Trustee
None on record
MRS LIZ WALLER Trustee
THORNTON-LE-STREET AND NORTH KILVINGTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
LAMBERT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.27k £0 £0 £159 £0
Total expenditure £1.27k £0 £0 £68.53k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 10 February 2025 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 27 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 20 January 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHESNEY VILLA
THORNTON LE STREET
THIRSK
YO7 4DS
Phone:
01845522677
Website:

No information available