Financial history DUSHINSKY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1020301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £901.89k £660.83k £744.86k £820.79k £519.20k
Total expenditure £994.16k £612.44k £768.11k £806.90k £544.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £901.89k £660.83k £744.86k £820.79k £519.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £993.24k £611.11k £756.69k £805.75k £543.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds £924 £1.33k £11.42k £1.14k £810
Expenditure - Governance £1.48k £1.05k £2.10k £2.08k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £991.76k £563.23k £708.52k £762.28k £523.59k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0