Accounts and annual returns HANWELL BUNNIES' PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1020315
Charity reporting is up to date (180 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 November 2024 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 27 November 2024 180 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 15 July 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 15 July 2023 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 June 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 01 June 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 June 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 14 June 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window