Governing document ROCHDALE & DISTRICT SCOPE
Charity Number: 1020427

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/10/1983 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE,CAUSE TO BE PROVIDED,OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT,EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE ROCHDALE AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.