Financial history FOUNDATION CHURCH OF THE DIVINE LIGHT

Charity number: 1020436
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £86 £70 £97 £56 £15
Total expenditure £18 £148 £40 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A