Governing document NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE FURNITURE MINE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/08/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY 1. THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ACCESSORIES 2. THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES, QUALIFICATIONS, WORK EXPERIENCE AND JOB SKILLS TO SUCH PERSONS CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NO OTHER MEANS OF OBTAINING HELP.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.