Financial history THE WARWICK TRUST

Charity number: 1020530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £53.66k £34.51k £82.57k £83.21k £44.11k
Total expenditure £104.17k £98.43k £63.55k £122.14k £102.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A