BHADRAN BANDHU SAMAJ (UK) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently we are aiming to raise funds to build hospital for poor people abroad. Help local charity for cancer research and polio research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jagrutbhai Patel | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jayrajbhai Bhadranwala | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Narendrabhai Patel | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.13k | £5.12k | £1.65k | £1.65k | £11.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.05k | £1.58k | £4.50k | £4.50k | £7.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 APRIL 1993
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE SICK BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL FACILITIES FOR SICK AND DISABLED PEOPLE OF SMALL MEANS WHEREVER THEY MAY BE RESIDENT 2) SUPPORTING OR PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOSPITALS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN THE STATE OF GUJARAT, INDIA B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WHEREVER THEY MAY BE RESIDENT C) TO ESTABLISH AND OPERATE A YOUTH CLUB IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR YOUNG PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Jacobean Close
CRAWLEY
RH10 7FZ
- Phone:
- 07900931974
- Email:
- devendrapatel@bhadran.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window