RECONCILIATION TRUST (LEEDS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church activities. During the year a Church service is held on Sunday mornings at The Reconciliation Centre in addition to this the Church conducts: 1.Prayer meetings 2.Bible studies 5.Baptism 6.Sunday activities:Kidzone 5-12 years.TIC/TAC 13-15 years.Rainbow from 2-4 years 7.Discipleship groups for:men,women,married couples 8.Monthly womens social group 9.Homework club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 05 May 1993: Standard registration
- CHAPELTOWN COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVE GANN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tim Kelleher | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE PRIMUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.34k | £98.44k | £66.96k | £71.02k | £77.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.79k | £73.04k | £72.55k | £65.37k | £56.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.2.THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITITONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Reconciliation Trust
Harehills Avenue
Leeds
LS8 4EX
- Phone:
- 07780705130
- Email:
- chapeltowncc@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window