Financial history St Joseph's Pre-School

Charity number: 1020613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £104.41k £124.75k £118.97k £124.60k £149.72k
Total expenditure £106.09k £96.75k £122.93k £123.43k £132.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.60k N/A N/A N/A