SCUNTHORPE GAY MEN AND WOMEN'S GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support group for the LGBT community of North Lincolnshire and its surrounding district. Dedicated to serving the community for whom it was set up over twenty years ago, organising weekly meetings, ocassional trips and events to suit its members needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 May 1993: Standard registration
- 27 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £581 | £810 | £629 | £629 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £651 | £1.67k | £797 | £797 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 May 2016 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 21 May 2015 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1990 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 1992 AND 19 APRIL 1993
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT HOMOSEXUALITY AND LESBIANISM.2.TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS SUFFERED BY PERSONS WHO ARE HOMOSEXUAL,BISEXUAL OR IN ANY DOUBT ABOUT THEIR SEXUAL IDENTITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE EAST RIDING AND KINGSTON UPON HULL & LINCOLNSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window