MAESTEG ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We take in and re home small animals that are lost or abandoned. We microchip vaccinate and re home. We also neuter as many cats and dogs as we can and help those on low income to pay their vet bills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 06 May 1993: Standard registration
- M A W S (Working name)
- MAWS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE ISAAC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MRS Jeanette Platt | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Budd | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr K J Brady | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ellis | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ellis | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mrs S John | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Brady | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHERYL ANN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.54k | £60.23k | £74.54k | £65.80k | £65.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.20k | £69.93k | £71.78k | £74.43k | £65.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1991 AS AMENDED 18 MARCH 1993, FEBRUARY 2010 AND 26 OCTOBER 2010. AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF ALL KINDS OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF ATTENTION FROM WHATEVER CAUSE. (B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HEALTH, CARE MANAGEMENT AND CONTROL OF ANIMALS: PARTICULARLY DOMESTIC ANIMALS. (C) TO ASSIST PEOPLE IN ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF ANIMALS. (D) TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AND SERVICES AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH LODGE
COURT COLMAN
BRIDGEND
CF31 4NG
- Phone:
- 01656721496
- Email:
- janbrady1@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window