HATCH GRANGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Princess Anne Premature Baby Unit- Knitted Items, League of Friends local Hospital, local Church Lunch Club, Children's Charity, Barnados, Womens Refuge', collection of green bottle tops, collection of stamps, collection of ring-pulls for as charity in the Phillipines, collection of books for local charity shops,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 06 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Hobbs | Chair | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Hughes | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Clark | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Nicholas | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Templeton | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Cook | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan REYNOLDS | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris White | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA CHARLESWORTH | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
June Thew | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
LIBBY WHITLOCK | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12k | £3.12k | £1.43k | £3.01k | £4.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99k | £2.72k | £1.59k | £2.67k | £4.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WEST END, BITTERNE, HEDGE END.
Contact information
- Address:
-
W I House
22-24 Southampton Road
EASTLEIGH
SO50 9XB
- Phone:
- 02380616712
- Email:
- colin-hobbs8@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window