EBA PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bedfordshire Primary School providing education for children aged four to eleven. The charity is the parents of the schools fundraising body.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 06 May 1993: Standard registration
- HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- HSA (Working name)
- EATON BRAY LOWER SCHOOL HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vaiva Sataite | Chair | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wright | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marta Makai | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.29k | £8.56k | £6.49k | £5.35k | £8.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.28k | £2.64k | £5.14k | £2.44k | £14.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ORIGINAL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1985 AMENDED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1992 as amended on 24 Sep 2018 as amended on 13 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCHOOL LANE
EATON BRAY
DUNSTABLE
BEDFORDSHIRE
LU6 2HN
- Phone:
- 01525220468
- Email:
- admin@eba.ec
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window