WERRINGTON PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE CHILDREN FROM THE AGE OF 2 YEARS OLD WITH QUALITY AND AFFORDABLE PRESCHOOL EDUCATION. ALSO TO PROVIDE QUALITY AFFORDABLE BEFORE AND AFTER SCHOOL AND HOLIDAY CARE FOR CHILDREN WHO ATTEND WERRINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 07 May 1993: Standard registration
- 30 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- WERRINGTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.34k | £68.05k | £107.91k | £87.04k | £76.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.67k | £68.99k | £102.44k | £88.40k | £74.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED ON THE 22 OCTOBER 1996.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window