NEWLINK PROJECT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of tuition in information computer technology principally to physically disabled persons with the long term objective of increasing their employment potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 May 1993: Standard registration
- 08 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE NEWLINK PROJECT LIMITED (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.76k | £135.04k | £216.83k | £243.60k | £126.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.63k | £183.70k | £192.03k | £239.55k | £151.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 08 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 13 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 17 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 03 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 06 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 29 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 5 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS PARTICULARLY (THOUGH NOT LIMITED TO) EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY. TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY BY IMPROVING THE OPPORTUNITY OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT BY PROVIDING SUCH EDUCATION AND TRAINING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE EAST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window