Bournville Village Primary School PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising events for Bournville Village Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 May 1993: Standard registration
- Bournville PTA (Working name)
- Bournville Village Primary School PTA (Working name)
- BOURNVILLE SCHOOLS HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID EDWARD JAMES ROBERTS | Chair | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amy Claire Cooper | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.85k | £10.84k | £4.74k | £3.69k | £26.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.02k | £11.73k | £10.19k | £9.44k | £12.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MAY 1986 as amended on 19 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bournville Village Primary School
Linden Road
BIRMINGHAM
B30 1JY
- Phone:
- 0121 675 9098
- Email:
- bournvillehsa@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window