BROCKENHURST PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of early years education and play for children of pre-school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £28,143 from 1 government contract(s) and £2,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 07 May 1993: Standard registration
- 12 May 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 May 2022: Funds transferred to 1016836 BROCKENHURST PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS A...
- BROCKENHURST PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.67k | £65.61k | £40.40k | £35.84k | £62.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.39k | £45.96k | £43.84k | £39.23k | £63.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £33.37k | £64.01k | £28.88k | £25.69k | £28.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | £133 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 05 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 05 June 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2007, 30 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 8 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BROCKENHURST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window