HAYWOOD ROAD PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Committee-run pre-school which provides high-quality, nurturing and playful education for children in Mapperley, Nottingham for children aged two to 5 years old five days a week term time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 May 1993: Standard registration
- 30 November 2021: Funds received from 506384 WESTDALE PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
- HAYWOOD ROAD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
valerie Holland | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
suannah tesu | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Waplington | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meghann waplington | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gina Conquest | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.57k | £65.04k | £70.69k | £72.86k | £67.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.81k | £58.06k | £73.47k | £77.99k | £77.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £50.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.80k | £2.92k | £54.06k | £55.23k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 September 2023 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 haywood road
Mapperley
Nottingham
Nottingham
Nottinghamshire
NG3 6AB
- Phone:
- 07713157665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window