ALLITHWAITE CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for Allithwaite CE Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 11 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abbie Young | Chair | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Lambert Mrs | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SWIFT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.12k | £6.87k | £21.77k | £1.44k | £16.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17k | £7.48k | £19.38k | £2.79k | £6.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 August 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 1993 as amended on 31 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
The purpose of the association is to advance the education of pupils in the school by developing effective relationships between the staff, parents & others associated with the school. We seek to engage in activities, provide facilities and equipment which support the school and the wrap around care it provides as well as advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ROAD
ALLITHWAITE
GRANGE OVER SANDS
CUMBRIA
LA11 7RD
- Phone:
- 01539532144
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window