Financial history WESTMARK TRUST

Charity number: 1020764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £114.04k £33.89k £119.41k £121.04k £103.10k
Total expenditure £110.03k £36.64k £117.20k £124.01k £91.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A