Accounts and annual returns GOLDEN HEARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1020783
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 22 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 30 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required