Financial history GOLDEN HEARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1020783
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £980 £1.56k £1.88k £1.44k £1.22k
Total expenditure £388 £223 £742 £355 £610
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A