GUILD OF FRIENDS OF CAMBORNE-REDRUTH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide equipment and furnishings for the benefit of patients and staff at the hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 May 1993: Standard registration
- GUILD OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS OF CAMBORNE-REDRUTH AND BARNCOOSE HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- GUILD OF HOSPITAL FRIENDS OF CAMBORNE-REDRUTH COMMUNITY HOSPITALS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Chapman | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIET MARY JENKIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.95k | £2.95k | £1.49k | £7.45k | £2.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.57k | £22.57k | £5.18k | £32.94k | £6.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITALS AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITALS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Coach Lane
REDRUTH
Cornwall
TR15 2TP
- Phone:
- 07850186733
- Email:
- rowan.mulliss@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window