Trustees SUNSHINE PRE-SCHOOL PURITON
Charity number: 1020832

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monet Williams | Chair | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Price | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Kelland | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sadie Cratchley | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saffron Sartin | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Steventon | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Wills | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Wylde | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Holl | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shawnee Harrington-Brice | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Tidy | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.