Financial history ASSOCIATION FOR COMPARATIVE CLINICAL PATHOLOGY

Charity number: 1020860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/01/2020 02/01/2021 02/01/2022 02/01/2023 02/01/2024
Total gross income £7.20k £0 £0 £10.37k £5.20k
Total expenditure £5.36k £732 £307 £7.81k £9.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A