Financial history BAPTIST EXPRESSION OF MARRIAGE ENCOUNTER

Charity number: 1020890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.81k £6.08k £6.50k £5.06k £4.88k
Total expenditure £8.66k £300 £6.16k £5.36k £4.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A