Financial history VALLEY CENTRE

Charity number: 1020907
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £1.88k £3.09k £2.38k £2.23k £1.31k
Total expenditure £2.17k £2.52k £3.20k £2.29k £1.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A