THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN AND ST ELIZABETH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates as the corporate trustee of a charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 19 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady Nuala Patricia O'Loan | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Hirsch David Taube | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Peregrine Towneley | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Professor HH William Patrick Morris | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Francis Fitzherbert-Brockholes | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
Norbert Reis | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Alda Doreen Andreotti | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Patrick Lawless | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JULIAN SCHILD MA ACA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2023 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 APRIL 1993, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MARCH 1998. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2016 as amended on 21 Jun 2021 as amended on 15 May 2024
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE A HOSPITAL FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF PATIENTS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FOR PATIENTS REQUIRING PALLIATIVE CARE; AND 2. TO SERVE THE SICK AND THE DYING AND TO CARE FOR THE PHYSICAL SPIRITUAL AND EMOTIONAL NEEDS OF PATIENTS IRRESPECTIVE OF NATIONALITY OR RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 GROVE END ROAD
LONDON
NW8 9NH
- Phone:
- 02078064089
- Email:
- info@hje.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window