NEWINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of hall for use by local and neighbouring persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 14 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN FAGG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Patricia Clark | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Blackett | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLARE STEVENS | Trustee | 23 August 2011 |
|
|||||
CLEONE HELEN CURTIS | Trustee | 01 June 1991 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ELIZABETH ANNE FAGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.52k | £23.09k | £21.05k | £19.74k | £20.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.51k | £15.76k | £7.22k | £24.02k | £18.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.05k | £6.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AND LEASE DATED 23 DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE PARISH OF NEWINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Playstool Road
Newington
Sittingbourne
ME9 7NL
- Phone:
- 01795485265
- Email:
- bowls.cle@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window