Accounts and annual returns MATLOCK BATH PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1020943
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 September 2024 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 September 2024 81 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 October 2023 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 09 October 2023 101 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 October 2023 466 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 October 2023 466 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 March 2022 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 March 2022 245 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 May 2021 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 May 2021 310 days late Download Open in new window