AGAINST BREAST CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Against Breast Cancer funds a unique research programme into the treatment and prevention of breast cancer, focusing particularly on secondary spread and survival after diagnosis. We are leading the worlds largest study into the diet and lifestyle of breast cancer patients. Our Research Teams quest to produce a breast cancer vaccine and ultimately a cure for breast cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 1993: Standard registration
- AGAINST BREAST CANCER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEANNE CATHERINE CHATTOE | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Anthony Leathem | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2024 | 632 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 May 2021 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH MAY 1993 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 15 NOVEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER PARTICULARLY BREAST CANCER AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leathem House
13 Napier Court Barton Lane
Abingdon
Oxfordshire
OX14 3YT
- Phone:
- 01235534211
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window