WALLINGFORD CHAMELEON ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wallingford Chameleon Arts provide a platform for talented musicians to perform in a series of high quality concerts, giving the population the opportunity to hear live music, including some less well known and recently composed works, played at an excellent standard by musicians who are often young. This gives a service to musicians and the public who may not otherwise have the opportunity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 18 May 1993: Standard registration
- MUSIC AT ST PETER'S (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURENCE ATTEWILL | Chair | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Carol Heaton | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Carter | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Amanda Gay Hines | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Astrid Cottee | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Elizabeth Spence | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER HOWEL GILES MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY JONATHAN BOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.42k | £6.62k | £16.66k | £22.71k | £23.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.54k | £8.49k | £19.45k | £23.71k | £22.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 APR 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC EVENTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Firs
Reading Road
WALLINGFORD
Oxfordshire
OX10 9DT
- Phone:
- 01491837150
- Email:
- info@wcm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window