Accounts and annual returns CLAREMONT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1021079
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 17 April 2015 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 15 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 07 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required