Financial history CLAREMONT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1021079
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £1.26k £1.28k £1.15k £1.23k £1.29k
Total expenditure £1.47k £1.35k £1.24k £1.26k £1.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A