PARENTS AND FRIENDS OF LYMINGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1021083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SOCIAL AND FUND RAISING EVENTS FOR MONIES FOR ASSOCIATED SCHOOL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £7,628
Total expenditure: £8,111

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 May 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gemma Best Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Christelle Chamberlan Trustee 10 September 2018
None on record
Tara Anderson Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.31k £5.43k £6.60k £7.99k £7.63k
Total expenditure £2.03k £8.46k £3.36k £8.08k £8.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lyminge C Of E Primary School
Church Road
Lyminge
FOLKESTONE
Kent
CT18 8JA
Phone:
07967496927
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available