THE CHARLOTTE STRAKER PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of residential and nursing care to the residents of Charlotte Straker House along with the maintenance of accommodation in the form of bungalows/flats which provide independent living to the occupants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,918,221
Donations and legacies | £872.52k | |
Charitable activities | £2.02m | |
Other trading activities | £15.05k | |
Investments | £11.62k | |
Other | £3.71k |
Total expenditure:
£2,141,023
Raising funds | £6.04k | |
Charitable activities | £2.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£23,231 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £615,198 from 4 government contract(s) and £2,845 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.13m | |
Retained for future use | £777.20k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.13m | |
Retained for future use | £800.43k |
People

65 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 17 May 1993: Standard registration
- CHARLOTTE STRAKER PROJECT (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Berenice Groves | Chair | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Barrie Dowdeswell | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
David Chesser | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Hugh Ritchie McKendrick | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Elizabeth Jane Hastings | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jane Iley | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Maureen Anne Gordon | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lesley Woodcock | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Gavin MacFarlane Black | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
Dr WILLIAM FRANCIS CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39m | £1.45m | £1.78m | £2.02m | £2.92m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.40m | £1.62m | £1.85m | £2.09m | £2.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £607.79k | £615.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £87.52k | £95.78k | £47.89k | £2.85k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £100.90k | £249.67k | £321.36k | £199.89k | £872.52k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £33.60k | £36.57k | £6.51k | £21.90k | £15.05k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.25m | £1.16m | £1.45m | £1.78m | £2.02m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.58k | £6.07k | £4.09k | £7.91k | £11.62k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £14.79k | £3.71k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £616 | £0 | £32.09k | £24.28k | £703.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.38m | £1.62m | £1.85m | £2.08m | £2.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £15.52k | £2.16k | £3.39k | £11.81k | £6.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £48.79k | £51.94k | £6.41k | £6.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £410.07k | £416.01k | £413.36k | £395.38k | £360.59k | |
|
Long-term investments | £174.34k | £234.79k | £237.20k | £218.89k | £239.30k | |
|
Other assets | £817.82k | £653.54k | £657.88k | £637.62k | £1.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £58.09k | £68.55k | £137.20k | £174.30k | £139.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 22 APRIL 1993 AND 17 JUNE 1993. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 SEP 2017 as amended on 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
3.1.1 THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY DISTRICT OF TYNEDALE OR SUCH OTHER AREAS OF THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AS WELL AS THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS RESIDENT ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE CLOSE RELATIONS RESIDENT IN TYNEDALE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SHELTERED ACCOMMODATION, AND OF NURSING AND OTHER FACILITIES TO ALLEVIATE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH RESPECT TO HEALTH, HOUSING AND WELFARE PROBLEMS AMONGST PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE AGED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
LOCAL AUTH.DIST.OF TYNEDALE OR OTHER AREAS OF NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mrs Berenice Groves
COOKSON CLOSE
CORBRIDGE
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE45 5HB
- Phone:
- 01434633999
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window