YMCA CENTRAL AND ANGLIA TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Trust Fund is promoting the general purposes of the work of the Young Mens Christian Association Movement in accordance with the rules and principles from time to time approved and adopted by the National Council of YMCAs The area of benefit for the Fund is the current Central Region of YMCAs Grants are typically made for the direct benefit of young people aged 9 - 25
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 May 1993: Standard registration
- 16 January 2015: Funds received from 1046248 THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION ANGLIA REGIO...
- YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION CENTRAL REGION TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION CENTREL REGION TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Jenkinson | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
RICHARD William PENNINGTON | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Wendy Georgia Williamson | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Paul Kerridge | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Oliver Charles | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Eric Stanley Moore | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||
Peter Frederick Posner | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.16k | £21.36k | £69.60k | £48.97k | £27.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.29k | £19.37k | £42.14k | £43.08k | £62.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 OCT 1992 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 1993 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE WORK OF THE YMCA MOVEMENT.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE, DERBYSHIRE, HEREFORD & WORCESTER, HUNTINGDONSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE, LINCOLNSHIRE, METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF WEST MIDLANDS, NORFOLK, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, RUTLAND, SHROPSHIRE, SATFFORDSHIRE, SUFFOLK AND WARWICKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 LANSDOWN CLOSE
BANBURY
OX16 9LH
- Phone:
- 07989333340
- Email:
- andywintworld@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window