LLANBISTER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1021128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Local village meeting of members providing training, interest and support to local members and events consistant with the WI Charter.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £1
Total expenditure: £299

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barbara Gayther Barbara Gayther Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £620 £701 £229 £194 £1
Total expenditure £674 £731 £375 £802 £299
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 07 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 28 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tynrhyn
Llanbister Road
LLANDRINDOD WELLS
LD1 6UG
Phone:
07813934792
Website:

womens-institute.co.uk