Financial history MAGIC ROUNDABOUT

Charity number: 1021135
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £51.12k £46.24k £52.00k £43.94k £8.94k
Total expenditure £51.74k £48.97k £52.04k £51.92k £22.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A