COMMUNITY ROAD TENANTS AND RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION AND SOCIAL CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
wE ARE A LOCAL COMMUNITY CENTRE OPEN TO EVERYONE.WE CATER FOR THE ELDERLY WITH A CLUB EVERY WEEK.WE HAVE TRIPS OUT AND HOLIDAYS.KARATE CLASSES,MARIE CURIE COFFEE MORNINGS EVERY YEAR.UNFUNDED GROUPS ARE ALLOWED TO USE THE HALL.LEISURE ACTIVITIES ARE FISHING CLUB DARTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £3,567 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
Governance
- 25 May 1993: Standard registration
- MAJOR ROAD TENANTS AND RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anita Foreman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Foreman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.14k | £117.37k | £77.19k | £92.23k | £132.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.94k | £118.60k | £42.73k | £31.01k | £44.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £1.00k | £3.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 April 2023 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 April 2023 | 167 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN MAJOR ROAD TENANTS AND RESIDENTS AREA BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO FURTHER HEALTH, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR ANY SOCIAL ACTIVITIES THE RESIDENTS MAY DESIRE. (B)TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN THE MAINTENANCE OF THE ABOVE CENTRE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
MAJOR ROAD TENANTS AND RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Road Tenantsy
Community Road
LONDON
E15 1JT
- Phone:
- 02085340664
- Email:
- FOREMANANITA@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window