CLATWORTHY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1021172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raises money for the maintenance and upkeep of a village hall for the general use of the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,459
Total expenditure: £4,115

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Chesterman Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Christopher Nigel Sanders Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Amanda Jane Chesterman Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Linda Sharp Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Susan Clare Sanders Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
PETER MORAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.29k £953 £1.32k £2.32k £2.46k
Total expenditure £4.10k £1.33k £1.47k £24.25k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 March 2024 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Forches
Clatworthy
Taunton
TA4 2EP
Phone:
01984629042
Website:

No information available