Trustees GUILDFORD EAST DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1021177

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr D Lester | Chair | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Ritchie | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dawn Marie Smith | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Desmond | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harman | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas George Crane | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Wright | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Neale | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robin John Beeson | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Russell David Baldwin | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Albert Ayears | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS CORNWELL | Trustee | 01 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Charles Smith | Trustee | 22 May 2002 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick McKie | Trustee | 01 February 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.