ROTARY CLUB OF SOLIHULL ST ALPHEGE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity assists with funds for local good causes and charities in Solihull and the West Midlands UK. Members of the Rotary Club of Solihull St Alphege decide on which beneficiaries to support on a monthly or annual basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Newman | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sunderland | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Cole | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norman Leslie Kaphan | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BLYTH | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.81k | £5.76k | £9.34k | £8.69k | £3.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.19k | £9.21k | £10.47k | £7.14k | £6.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF TH POOR AND NEEDY,OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE,INSTITUTION,SOCIETY OR OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Rising Lane
Knowle
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B93 0BZ
- Phone:
- 07557018100
- Email:
- rblythoph@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window