HARRIETSHAM PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Pre-School is based in the village of Harrietsham, in Kent and offers a service to families from the village, and surrounding area. between the ages of 1 and 5 years old. In May 2018 we were graded 'Good with outstanding' by Ofsted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £81,423 from 3 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 20 May 1993: Standard registration
- HARRIETSHAM PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Johnson | Chair | 06 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Chloe Hannon | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Sophie Arthurs | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Charlee Guy | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Willow Burford | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Suzanna Gamwell | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.20k | £79.71k | £87.93k | £86.72k | £109.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.14k | £92.86k | £100.65k | £102.99k | £107.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.87k | £64.46k | £64.36k | £66.80k | £81.42k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £2.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 October 2023 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 October 2023 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 September 2023 | 483 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 September 2023 | 483 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 October 2020 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 02 October 2020 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY; (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF SUCH NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE PLAYGROUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John The Baptist
Marley Road
Harrietsham
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME17 1AX
- Phone:
- 07458915213
- Website:
-
harrietshampreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window