Trustees CHURCH CROOKHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1021343

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Robinson | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Collins | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Walters | Trustee | 28 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Minty | Trustee | 25 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hooker | Trustee | 25 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pamela McKewon | Trustee | 25 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marion Pennell | Trustee | 25 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZA JANE JAMES | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNE TRACEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS VAL ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.