Accounts and annual returns SHEILA KAY FUND

Charity Number: 1021378
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On Time