Accounts and annual returns BURTON-IN-LONSDALE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1021403
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 03 August 2008 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 03 August 2008 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 05 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 27 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required