COLLINGWOOD UNDER FIVES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE-SCHOOL FOR LOCAL CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF FIVE (5) BUT OVER THE AGE OF TWO (2).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 25 May 1993: Standard registration
- COLLINGWOOD UNDER FIVES PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- COLLINGWOOD UNDER FIVES PRE-SCHHOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanne Matthews | Chair | 04 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Daisy May Wilson | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Smith | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Emily Muzzlewhite | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jan Green | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ann Nicholls | Trustee | 14 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.49k | £105.69k | £113.61k | £125.56k | £142.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.31k | £100.82k | £115.88k | £127.76k | £135.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.09k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Taffrail Gardens
South Woodham Ferrers
CHELMSFORD
CM3 5WH
- Phone:
- 07757217405
- Website:
-
collingwoodpreschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window