WILCOVE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate in a rural area of Cornwall - a small river inlet village. We meet monthly - usually with a speaker, but sometimes a member's evening. Twice a year we get together with other WIs in the Torpoint /Rame cluster. We organise trips and attend County WI functions/activities. We make federation resolutions which we hope will have an impact on the wider community of GB or even the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 May 1993: Standard registration
- 29 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | 31/01/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.27k | £1.12k | £1.91k | £1.14k | £2.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £1.13k | £1.68k | £905 | £1.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 11 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 20 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | 31 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | 25 July 2006 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 06 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES(ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WILCOVE, TORPOINT, ANTONY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window